OH HB222 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Effective 9/30/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 339.10 and 513.172 of the Revised Code to specify that a nonprofit formed or acquired by a county hospital or joint township district hospital is a separate entity from the hospital.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specify that certain hospital nonprofits are separate entities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24 Effective 9/30/21
2021-06-24SenatePassed
2021-06-16SenateReported: Local Government and Elections
2021-05-12SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government and Elections
2021-05-06HousePassed
2021-04-21HouseReported: Civil Justice
2021-03-23HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2021-03-17HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33910Amended CodeCitation Text
513172Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-222
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb222/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb222/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb222/PH/02/hb222_02_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb222/RS/03/hb222_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb222/PS/04/hb222_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb222/EN/05/hb222_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16265&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16352&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16397&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16387&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16579&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16685&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17016&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17053&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17110&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17215&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17267&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17297&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-222

Bill Comments

feedback