OH HB215 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 77-9)
Status: Passed on November 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-16 - Effective 3/2/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 3701.353 of the Revised Code to enact The Business Fairness Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enact The Business Fairness Act

Sponsors

Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]
Rep. Adam Bird [R]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]
Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Rodney Creech [R]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Bill Dean [R]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Sarah Fowler Arthur [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Thomas Hall [R]
Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Larry Householder [R]
Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Mark Johnson [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Kris Jordan [R]
Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Brian Lampton [R]
Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Susan Manchester [R]
Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Derek Merrin [R]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]
Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Jena Powell [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]
Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Brian Stewart [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]
Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Bob Young [R]
Rep. Tom Young [R]Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]
Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]
Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]
Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. George Lang [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]
Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Sandra O'Brien [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]
Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]
Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-11-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-16 Effective 3/2/22
2021-11-16SenatePassed
2021-11-10SenateReported: Small Business and Economic Opportunity
2021-05-12SenateRefer to Committee: Small Business and Economic Opportunity
2021-05-06HousePassed - Amended
2021-05-06HouseInformally passed
2021-05-05HouseInformally passed
2021-04-21HouseReported - Amended: Economic and Workforce Development
2021-03-17HouseRefer to Committee: Economic and Workforce Development
2021-03-16HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3701353New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-215
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb215/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb215/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb215/PH/02/hb215_02_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb215/RS/03/hb215_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb215/PS/04/hb215_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb215/EN/05/hb215_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16108&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16283&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16393&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16512&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16584&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16697&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17790&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17788&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17826&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17855&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17921&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18101&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-215

Bill Comments

feedback