OH HB215 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective 3/23/18 - Certain provisions effective 1/01/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective 3/23/18 - Certain provisions effective 1/01/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1901.01, 1901.02, 1901.03, 1901.07, 1901.08, 1901.312, 1901.34, and 1907.11 of the Revised Code to create the Paulding County Municipal Court in Paulding on January 1, 2020, to establish one full-time judgeship in that court, to provide for the nomination of the judge by petition only, to abolish the Paulding County County Court on that date, and to provide for the election for the Paulding County Municipal Court of one full-time judge in 2019.
Title
Create Paulding County Municipal Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Effective 3/23/18 - Certain provisions effective 1/01/20 | |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Passed |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Reported: Judiciary |
2017-09-27 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-09-20 | House | Passed |
2017-06-21 | House | Reported - Amended: Criminal Justice |
2017-05-16 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2017-05-09 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
19 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 01 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 312 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 07 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |