OH HB215 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 119.12, 4715.03, 4715.031, 4715.06, 4715.14, 4715.141, 4715.30, and 4753.06 and to enact sections 4715.032, 4715.033, 4715.034, 4715.035, 4715.036, 4715.037, 4715.038, 4715.039, 4715.0310, 4753.091, and 5111.0211 of the Revised Code and to contingently amend Section 3 of Sub. H.B. 190 of the 128th General Assembly to modify the laws governing investigations and hearings conducted by the State Dental Board, to modify the laws specifying when certain continuing education requirements for dental hygienists are applicable, to modify the laws governing the licensure of audiologists and speech-language pathologists, to modify the laws governing appeals of administrative adjudications, and to specify a situation in which a nursing facility is not required to submit a Medicaid claim for Medicare cost-sharing expenses.
Title
And to contingently amend Section 3 of Sub. H.B. 190 of the 128th General Assembly to modify the laws governing investigations and hearings conducted by the State Dental Board, to modify the laws specifying when certain continuing education requirements for dental hygienists are applicable, to modify the laws governing the licensure of audiologists and speech-language pathologists, to modify the laws governing appeals of administrative adjudications, and to specify a situation in which a nursing facility is not required to submit a Medicaid claim for Medicare cost-sharing expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-13 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-13 | Governor' Action | |
2010-06-21 | End of 10-day period | |
2010-06-09 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-06-02 | Concurrence | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Committee Report - S | |
2010-03-04 | To Health, Human Services, & Aging | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2009-10-08 | Committee Report - S | |
2009-06-09 | To Health | |
2009-06-09 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 19 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 15 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 0310 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 15 | 032 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 15 | 033 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 15 | 034 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 15 | 035 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 15 | 036 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 15 | 037 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 15 | 038 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 15 | 039 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 15 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 141 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 15 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 53 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 53 | 091 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
51 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
51 | 11 | 0211 | New Code | See Bill Text |