OH HB215 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2008 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-04-16 - To Judiciary Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Judiciary - Criminal Justice Committee
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2008 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-04-16 - To Judiciary Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Judiciary - Criminal Justice Committee
Summary
To amend section 3719.41 of the Revised Code to list Salvia divinorum as a controlled substance.
Title
Controlled substances-include Salvia divinorum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-16 | To Judiciary Criminal Justice | |
2008-04-16 | Introduced to Senate | |
2008-04-15 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2008-04-08 | Committee Report | |
2007-05-09 | To Criminal Justice | |
2007-05-09 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_215 |