OH HB209 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on October 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2103.02, 2103.09, and 2106.24 of the Revised Code to abolish the estate by dower.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abolish estate by dower

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2019-10-28SenateIntroduced
2019-10-24HousePassed
2019-10-09HouseReported: Civil Justice
2019-04-30HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2019-04-18HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21Amended CodeCitation Text
2103Amended CodeCitation Text
210302Amended CodeCitation Text
210309Amended CodeCitation Text
2106Amended CodeCitation Text
210624Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback