OH HB206 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-04-09 - Effective Appropriations effective January 8, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-04-09 - Effective Appropriations effective January 8, 2025
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3313.66, 3313.661, 3313.7117, and 3319.324 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 265.270 of H.B. 33 of the 135th General Assembly as subsequently amended with respect to the expulsion of a student from a public school for actions that endanger the health and safety of other students or school employees, regarding automatic closures of community schools and the storage and use of drugs used to treat seizure, and to increase the earmarked funding for school choice program administration.
Title
Regards public school expulsion for actions dangerous to others
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Click [R] | Rep. Monica Robb Blasdel [R] | Sen. Andrew Brenner [R] | Sen. Jerry Cirino [R] |
Sen. Bill Reineke [R] | Sen. Michele Reynolds [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-12-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 62 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-12-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-12-18 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-12-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 68 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-12-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-12-18 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-12-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 68 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-04-09 | Effective Appropriations effective January 8, 2025 | |
2025-01-08 | Signed By The Governor | |
2024-12-30 | Sent To The Governor | |
2024-12-18 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2024-12-18 | Senate | Passed |
2024-12-18 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Education |
2024-12-11 | Senate | Referred to committee: Education |
2024-12-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-12-04 | House | Passed |
2023-11-29 | House | Reported - Substitute: Primary and Secondary Education |
2023-06-07 | House | Referred to committee: Primary and Secondary Education |
2023-06-06 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 13 | 66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 661 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 7117 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 324 | Amended Code | Citation Text |