OH HB206 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-14)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4513.35 and 4513.39 of the Revised Code to permit a township police officer who serves a population between 5,000 and 50,000 to enforce specified traffic offenses on interstate highways within the township if authorized by that township's board of trustees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permit township police enforce certain offenses on interstate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12HousePassed
2021-04-21HouseReported: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-03-16HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-03-11HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
451335Amended CodeCitation Text
451339Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-206
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb206/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb206/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb206/PH/02/hb206_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16111&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16272&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16371&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16405&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16665&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16675&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-206

Bill Comments 750

feedback