OH HB203 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-15 - Refer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education
Pending: Senate Workforce and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-15 - Refer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education
Pending: Senate Workforce and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 109.73, 109.77, 109.771, 109.78, 109.804, 147.01, 147.63, 169.16, 173.21, 173.391, 173.422, 503.41, 715.27, 903.07, 905.321, 917.09, 917.091, 921.06, 921.11, 921.12, 921.24, 921.26, 926.30, 928.02, 943.09, 956.05, 956.06, 1315.04, 1315.13, 1315.23, 1321.04, 1321.37, 1321.53, 1321.64, 1321.74, 1322.10, 1322.21, 1513.07, 1513.161, 1514.12, 1514.47, 1531.40, 1533.051, 1533.51, 1561.14, 1561.15, 1561.16, 1561.17, 1561.18, 1561.19, 1561.20, 1561.21, 1561.22, 1565.06, 1565.15, 1707.15, 1707.151, 1707.16, 1707.161, 1707.163, 1707.165, 1717.06, 3101.10, 3301.071, 3301.074, 3319.088, 3319.22, 3319.226, 3319.229, 3319.26, 3319.261, 3319.262, 3319.27, 3319.28, 3319.301, 3319.303, 3319.361, 3327.10, 3703.21, 3704.14, 3713.05, 3717.09, 3723.03, 3723.06, 3737.83, 3737.881, 3742.05, 3743.03, 3743.16, 3743.40, 3743.51, 3748.07, 3748.12, 3769.03, 3770.05, 3772.13, 3772.131, 3773.36, 3773.421, 3781.10, 3781.102, 3781.105, 3905.041, 3905.062, 3905.063, 3905.07, 3905.071, 3905.072, 3905.08, 3905.09, 3905.30, 3905.471, 3905.72, 3905.81, 3905.85, 3916.03, 3951.03, 3951.05, 3951.09, 4104.07, 4104.101, 4104.19, 4105.02, 4169.03, 4301.10, 4508.03, 4508.04, 4508.08, 4511.763, 4701.06, 4701.07, 4701.10, 4703.08, 4703.10, 4703.33, 4703.35, 4703.37, 4707.07, 4707.072, 4707.09, 4709.07, 4709.08, 4709.10, 4713.10, 4713.28, 4713.30, 4713.31, 4713.34, 4713.37, 4713.69, 4715.03, 4715.09, 4715.10, 4715.16, 4715.27, 4715.362, 4715.363, 4715.39, 4715.42, 4715.421, 4715.43, 4715.53, 4715.62, 4717.05, 4717.051, 4717.10, 4723.08, 4723.09, 4723.26, 4723.32, 4723.41, 4723.651, 4723.75, 4723.76, 4723.85, 4725.13, 4725.18, 4725.26, 4725.48, 4725.52, 4725.57, 4725.591, 4727.03, 4728.03, 4729.09, 4729.11, 4729.15, 4729.901, 4729.921, 4730.10, 4731.151, 4731.19, 4731.291, 4731.293, 4731.294, 4731.295, 4731.297, 4731.299, 4731.30, 4731.52, 4731.572, 4731.573, 4732.10, 4732.12, 4732.22, 4733.18, 4733.19, 4734.23, 4734.27, 4734.283, 4735.023, 4735.07, 4735.08, 4735.09, 4735.10, 4735.27, 4735.28, 4736.10, 4736.14, 4740.05, 4740.06, 4741.12, 4741.13, 4741.14, 4741.19, 4743.04, 4743.041, 4747.04, 4747.05, 4747.10, 4749.12, 4751.01, 4751.15, 4751.20, 4751.201, 4751.202, 4751.21, 4751.32, 4752.05, 4752.12, 4753.07, 4753.071, 4753.072, 4753.073, 4753.08, 4753.09, 4753.12, 4755.08, 4755.09, 4755.411, 4755.44, 4755.441, 4755.45, 4755.451, 4755.48, 4755.482, 4755.62, 4755.65, 4757.18, 4758.25, 4759.05, 4759.06, 4760.03, 4760.031, 4761.04, 4761.05, 4762.03, 4763.05, 4764.10, 4765.10, 4765.11, 4765.30, 4765.55, 4767.031, 4771.08, 4773.03, 4774.03, 4775.07, 4778.03, 4778.08, 4778.09, 4779.17, 4779.18, 4781.07, 4781.08, 4781.17, 4783.04, 5123.161, 5123.45, 5126.25, 5902.02, 5903.04, 6109.04, and 6111.46; to enact sections 3746.041, 4796.01, 4796.02, 4796.03, 4796.04, 4796.05, 4796.08, 4796.10, 4796.12, 4796.15, 4796.18, and 4796.20; and to repeal sections 921.08, 1322.24, 3905.081, 4707.12, 4740.08, and 4757.25 of the Revised Code to require an occupational licensing authority to issue a license or government certification to an applicant who holds a license, government certification, or private certification or has satisfactory work experience in another state under certain circumstances and to amend the version of section 3319.22 of the Revised Code that is scheduled to take effect on April 12, 2023, to continue the changes on and after that date.
Title
Require occupational license if experienced in another state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 56 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-15 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-06-01 | House | Passed |
2022-04-12 | House | Reported - Substitute: State and Local Government |
2021-03-16 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Employment
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : State Government
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : State Government