OH HB201 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-6)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-6)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1739.061, 1751.14, 1751.69, 3923.022, 3923.24, 3923.241, 3923.281, 3923.57, 3923.58, 3923.601, 3923.65, 3923.83, 3923.85, 3924.01, and 5301.36 and to enact sections 505.377, 737.082, 737.222, and 5301.361 of the Revised Code to make changes relative to entries of satisfaction, to clarify the status of volunteer firefighters for purposes of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, to make changes regarding coverage for a dependent child under a parent's health insurance plan and the hours of work needed to qualify for coverage under a small employer health benefit plan, to increase the duration of the health insurance considered to be short-term under certain insurance laws, and to make changes to the chemotherapy parity law.
Title
To make changes relative to entries of satisfaction, to clarify the status of volunteer firefighters for purposes of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, to make changes regarding coverage for a dependent child under a parent's health insurance plan and the hours of work needed to qualify for coverage under a small employer health benefit plan, to increase the duration of the health insurance considered to be short-term under certain insurance laws, and to make changes to the chemotherapy parity law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-17 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-11 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-10 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-02-27 | To Insurance & Financial Institutions | |
2014-02-27 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-02-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-02-13 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-06-11 | To Financial Institutions, Housing and Urban Development | |
2013-06-11 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 39 | 061 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 51 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 51 | 69 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
39 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 23 | 022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 241 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 281 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 58 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 83 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 23 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 24 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
5 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 05 | 377 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
53 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
53 | 01 | 234 | New Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 01 | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 01 | 361 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
7 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
7 | 37 | 082 | New Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 37 | 222 | New Code | See Bill Text |