OH HB2 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on November 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Passed - Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact sections 122.178, 122.179, 122.1710, and 122.1711 of the Revised Code and to amend Sections 259.10, 259.20, and 259.30 of H.B. 166 of the 133rd General Assembly to create the TechCred Program and the Individual Microcredential Assistance Program and to develop a grant program to support industry sector partnerships.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create TechCred and Microcredential Assistance Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13SenatePassed - Amended
2019-11-06SenateReported - Substitute: Finance
2019-07-17SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2019-06-13SenateIntroduced
2019-06-12HousePassed - Amended
2019-06-11HouseReported - Substitute: Finance
2019-06-05HouseRe-referred: Finance
2019-06-05HouseRe-referred - Substitute: Rules and Reference
2019-05-14HouseRefer to Committee: Economic and Workforce Development
2019-05-13HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1New CodeSee Bill Text
122New CodeSee Bill Text
1221710New CodeSee Bill Text
1221711New CodeSee Bill Text
122178New CodeSee Bill Text
122179New CodeSee Bill Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574701Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-HB-2
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb2/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb2/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb2/RCH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb2/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb2/PH/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb2/RS/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb2/PS/06?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-HB-2

Bill Comments

feedback