OH HB191 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-28)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Effective 10/11/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5534.501 of the Revised Code to designate a bridge along State Route 164 in Mahoning County as the "Don Manning Memorial Bridge."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Don Manning Memorial Bridge

Sponsors

Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Adam Bird [R]
Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]
Rep. Rodney Creech [R]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]
Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]
Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]
Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]
Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]
Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Brian Lampton [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]
Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Jena Powell [R]
Rep. Sharon Ray [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phillip Robinson [D]
Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]
Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Monique Smith [D]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]
Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]
Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]
Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]
Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]
Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]
Sen. George Lang [R]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]
Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]
Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24 Effective 10/11/21
2021-06-24SenatePassed
2021-06-23SenateReported: Transportation
2021-04-21SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation
2021-03-24HousePassed
2021-03-17HouseReported: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-03-10HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-03-09HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5534501New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-191
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb191/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb191/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb191/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb191/RS/03/hb191_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb191/PS/04/hb191_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb191/EN/05/hb191_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15984&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16025&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16041&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16054&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16195&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16197&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17148&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17158&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17187&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17220&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17270&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17306&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-191

Bill Comments

feedback