OH HB190 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
Pending: Senate Transportation, Commerce and Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4511.62, 4511.63, 4511.64, and 4511.712 of the Revised Code to require vehicle operators to watch, listen, and stop for on-track equipment that may be approaching a railroad crossing.
Title
Stop, watch, and listen for on-track equipment at rail crossings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-03-21 | House | Passed |
2017-12-14 | House | Reported: Transportation and Public Safety |
2017-05-01 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety |
2017-04-24 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 11 | 62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 11 | 712 | Amended Code | Citation Text |