OH HB187 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Refer to Committee: Small Business and Economic Opportunity
Pending: Senate Small Business and Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Refer to Committee: Small Business and Economic Opportunity
Pending: Senate Small Business and Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 4113.14 of the Revised Code to require an employer to provide earnings and deductions statements to each of the employer's employees.
Title
Require employer provide earnings and deductions statements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Small Business and Economic Opportunity |
2021-06-16 | House | Passed |
2021-06-10 | House | Reported: Commerce and Labor |
2021-03-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Commerce and Labor |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced |