OH HB185 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-06 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 9.06, 2909.03, and 2909.11 of the Revised Code to eliminate lack of the property owner's consent as an element of arson when the property is not an occupied structure and to make the consent of the owner of a structure that is not an occupied structure an affirmative defense, and to modify the provisions regarding the private operation and management of intensive program prisons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Excludes abandoned property owner's consent as element of arson

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-11-30 - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-06HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2016-12-01SenatePassed - Amended
2016-11-30SenateInformally passed
2016-11-30SenateInformally passed
2016-11-30SenateReported - Substitute: Criminal Justice
2016-02-23SenateRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2016-02-11SenateIntroduced
2016-02-10HousePassed
2016-01-27HouseReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2015-05-12HouseRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2015-05-05HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2909Amended CodeCitation Text
290903Amended CodeCitation Text
290911Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA131-HB-185
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb185/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb185/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb185/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb185/RS/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb185/PS/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb185/CH/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_131/bills/hb185/EN/06?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA131-HB-185

Bill Comments

feedback