OH HB18 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-45)
Status: Passed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Effective 5/26/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 5747.01 and 5747.10 of the Revised Code to exempt from the income tax disability severance payments received by honorably discharged veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempt veterans disability severance pay from income tax

Sponsors

Rep. Nino Vitale [R]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. John Becker [R]
Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]
Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]
Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Jon Cross [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Bill Dean [R]
Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]
Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]
Rep. Ron Hood [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]
Rep. Don Jones [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Rep. Candice Keller [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]
Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]
Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]
Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Derek Merrin [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joe Miller [D]
Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. John Patterson [D]
Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Jena Powell [R]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]
Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phil Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]
Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]
Rep. Michael Skindell [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Todd Smith [R]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]
Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]
Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]
Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]
Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]
Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]
Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]
Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]
Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2019-12-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-26 Effective 5/26/20
2020-01-28HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2019-12-17SenatePassed
2019-12-17SenateReported - Substitute: Ways and Means
2019-05-01SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2019-03-28SenateIntroduced
2019-03-27HousePassed
2019-03-20HouseReported: Ways and Means
2019-02-13HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574701Amended CodeCitation Text
574710Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback