OH HB18 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 57-13)
Status: Passed on August 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 57-13)
Status: Passed on August 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 122.176 of the Revised Code to authorize grants to an employer that moves operations into a previously vacant facility and increases payroll by hiring and employing employees at the facility.
Title
To authorize grants to an employer that moves operations into a previously vacant facility and increases payroll by hiring and employing employees at the facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 54 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-14 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 54 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-06 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-04 | Governor' Action | |
2012-05-08 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-04-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-18 | Concurrence | |
2012-03-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-12-15 | To Ways & Means & Economic Development | |
2011-12-15 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-12-14 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-12-07 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-01-11 | To Ways & Means | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 22 | 176 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 66 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 66 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 66 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 81 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 47 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 51 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 51 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |