OH HB177 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 50-29)
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 50-29)
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 4549.20 of the Revised Code to prohibit the manufacture, import, or sale of a counterfeit or nonfunctional motor vehicle air bag, to prohibit the sale, installation, or reinstallation of a device in a motor vehicle that causes the vehicle's diagnostic system to inaccurately indicate that the vehicle is equipped with a functional air bag, and to increase the penalty for improper replacement of a motor vehicle air bag if the violation results in serious physical harm to an individual.
Title
To prohibit the manufacture, import, or sale of a counterfeit or nonfunctional motor vehicle air bag, to prohibit the sale, installation, or reinstallation of a device in a motor vehicle that causes the vehicle's diagnostic system to inaccurately indicate that the vehicle is equipped with a functional air bag, and to increase the penalty for improper replacement of a motor vehicle air bag if the violation results in serious physical harm to an individual.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-04 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Effective Date | |
2013-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2013-12-24 | End of 10-day period | |
2013-12-12 | Sent to Governor | |
2013-12-04 | Concurrence | |
2013-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-10-30 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-06-26 | To Transportation | |
2013-06-26 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-06-25 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-06-19 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-05-28 | To Transportation, Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2013-05-28 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 49 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |