OH HB174 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 5 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-05 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2301.02 and 2301.03 of the Revised Code to add two judges to the Domestic Relations Division of the Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, one to be elected in 2018 and one to be elected in 2020, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Add judges to Franklin County Domestic Relations Division

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-05SenatePassed
2017-12-05SenateReported: Judiciary
2017-11-15SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2017-11-02SenateIntroduced
2017-11-01HousePassed
2017-10-24HouseReported - Amended: Civil Justice
2017-05-01HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2017-04-05HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2301Amended CodeCitation Text
230102Amended CodeCitation Text
230103Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback