OH HB172 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-24 - Re-referred: Health
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-24 - Re-referred: Health
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3701.74 and 3701.741 of the Revised Code to modify the laws governing access to a patient's medical records.
Title
Modify law governing access to patient medical records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | House | Re-referred: Health |
2017-12-13 | House | Reported - Substitute: Health |
2017-05-01 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 01 | 74 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 01 | 741 | Amended Code | Citation Text |