OH HB172 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Passed - Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Passed - Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1901.01, 1901.02, 1901.03, 1901.07, 1901.08, 1901.31, 1901.312, 1901.34, 1907.11, 2951.041, 2953.38, and 3772.99 and to enact sections 2927.21 and 2953.521 of the Revised Code to prohibit a person engaged in publishing or disseminating criminal record information from soliciting or accepting a fee to remove, correct, modify, or refrain from publishing or otherwise disseminating the information; to provide criminal and civil remedies for a violation of that prohibition; to provide that a person found not guilty of an offense or named in a dismissed complaint, indictment, or information may apply to the court for an order to expunge the person's official records in the case if the charge or finding was the result of the applicant having been a victim of human trafficking; to generally permit a person convicted of certain prostitution-related offenses to apply for the expungement of any record of conviction of an offense if the person's participation was a result of having been a victim of human trafficking; to authorize intervention in lieu of conviction for persons charged with committing an offense while a victim of compelling prostitution; to specify that the criminal penalty related to casino operators and employees participating in casino gaming applies at their casino facility or an affiliated casino facility to create the Perry County Municipal Court in New Lexington and abolish the Perry County County Court on January 1, 2018, establish one full-time judgeship in that court with the judge to be elected in 2017, provide for the nomination of the judge by petition only, and designate the Perry County Clerk of Courts as the clerk of that court.
Title
Creates fair and accurate publishing of criminal records law
Sponsors
Rep. John Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-05-18 | House | Passed |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported - Substitute: Commerce and Labor |
2015-05-05 | House | Refer to Committee: Commerce and Labor |
2015-04-28 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Criminal Records Checks
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Criminal Records Checks
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
13 | 49 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 49 | 71 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 49 | 72 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 49 | 73 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 49 | 74 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 49 | 75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
19 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 01 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 312 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 07 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
29 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 27 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 51 | 041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 53 | 38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | 521 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 72 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 72 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |