OH HB170 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Effective 6/2/21 - Certain sections effective September 1, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To provide assistance to schools and other entities in response to the COVID-19 pandemic and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide assistance to schools and other entities

Sponsors

Rep. Adam Bird [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]
Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]
Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]
Rep. Bill Dean [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]
Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Larry Householder [R]
Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]
Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. David Leland [D]
Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]
Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Phillip Robinson [D]Rep. Allison Russo [D]
Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Monique Smith [D]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]
Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]
Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]
Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]
Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Sandra O'Brien [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26 Effective 6/2/21 - Certain sections effective September 1, 2021
2021-05-26HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2021-05-26SenatePassed
2021-05-26SenateReported - Amended: Finance
2021-04-21SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2021-04-15HousePassed
2021-04-15HouseReported - Amended: Finance
2021-03-23HouseRe-referred: Finance
2021-03-17HouseReported: Primary and Secondary Education
2021-03-03HouseRefer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-170
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb170/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb170/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb170/RCH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb170/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb170/PH/04?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb170/RS/05/hb170_05_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb170/PS/06/hb170_06_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb170/EN/07/hb170_07_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15902&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15923&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16055&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16138&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16191&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16274&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16297&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16298&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16309&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16315&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16841&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16850&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16848&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16855&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16905&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17303&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-170

Bill Comments

feedback