OH HB169 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-25 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-25 - Effective Date
Summary
To amend section 3734.13 and to enact sections 3734.91, 3734.911, 3734.912, 3734.913, 3734.914, and 3734.915 of the Revised Code to establish requirements governing the disposal and collection of used lead-acid batteries.
Title
Used lead-acid batteries-collection/disposal requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Wagner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-25 | Effective Date | |
2008-01-25 | Governor Action | |
2008-01-29 | End of 10-day Period | |
2008-01-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2008-01-15 | Concurrence | |
2007-11-14 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2007-10-24 | Committee Report | |
2007-06-14 | To Environment & Natural Resources | |
2007-06-14 | Introduced to Senate | |
2007-06-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2007-06-07 | Committee Report | |
2007-04-19 | To Economic Development & Environment | |
2007-04-19 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_169 |