OH HB168 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Effective 6/29/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To remit funds from the State Fiscal Recovery Fund to repay unemployment advances, to provide funds to support improvements at pediatric behavioral health care facilities, to require the Development Services Agency to establish the Water and Sewer Quality Program, and to make appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide grants to businesses, fairs, child care, veterans homes

Sponsors

Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]
Rep. Adam Bird [R]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Rodney Creech [R]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]
Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]
Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]
Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]
Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]
Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Phillip Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]
Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]
Rep. Monique Smith [D]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Brian Stewart [R]
Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]
Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Bob Young [R]
Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]
Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]
Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]
Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. George Lang [R]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]
Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]
Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]
Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25 Effective 6/29/21
2021-06-25HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2021-06-24SenatePassed - Amended
2021-06-24SenateInformally passed
2021-06-23SenateInformally passed
2021-06-23SenateReported - Substitute: Finance
2021-04-21SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2021-04-15HousePassed
2021-04-15HouseReported - Amended: Finance
2021-04-14HouseRe-referred: Finance
2021-03-24HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2021-03-03HouseRefer to Committee: Economic and Workforce Development
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-168
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb168/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb168/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb168/RCH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb168/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb168/PH/04?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb168/RS/05/hb168_05_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb168/PS/06/hb168_06_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb168/EN/07/hb168_07_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15927&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16019&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16181&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16189&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16186&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16295&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16302&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16336&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16382&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17143&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17154&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17144&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17219&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17212&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17269&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17319&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-168

Bill Comments

feedback