OH HB166 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 181.21, 2152.13, 2152.14, 2901.011, 2929.01, 2929.14, 2929.144, 2929.19, 2930.16, 2945.37, 2945.401, 2949.08, 2951.03, 2953.07, 2967.14, 2967.191, 2967.193, 2967.271, 5120.021, 5120.038, 5120.113, 5120.66, and 5149.04; to enact new section 2953.08 and section 181.26; and to repeal section 2953.08 of the Revised Code to modify the Criminal Sentencing Law with respect to non-life felony indefinite sentencing, to modify the process for felony appeals as a matter of right, to modify the Corrections Law regarding a Department of Rehabilitation and Correction reentry program for certain offenders, maximum workload and caseload standards for parole and field officers, GPS monitoring of offenders released from prison, and entry into LEADS of specified information about GPS-monitored offenders, and to require the Ohio Criminal Sentencing Commission to appoint an Offender Supervision Study Committee.
Title
Regards criminal sentencing and corrections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2021-03-03 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Prisons
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Prisons
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 81 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 52 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 52 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 01 | 011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 144 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 30 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 45 | 37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 45 | 401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 49 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 51 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 67 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 67 | 191 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 67 | 193 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 67 | 271 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 20 | 021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 20 | 038 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 20 | 113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 20 | 66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 49 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |