OH HB165 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-25)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Effective 5/11/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-25)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Effective 5/11/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.2518 of the Revised Code to designate June as "Congenital Cytomegalovirus Awareness Month."
Title
Designate Congenital Cytomegalovirus Awareness Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Effective 5/11/18 | |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-05-10 | House | Passed |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported - Amended: Health |
2017-05-01 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2017-03-28 | House | Introduced |