OH HB165 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-11 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-11 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To enact sections 3301.60, 3301.61, 3301.62, 3301.63, and 3301.64 of the Revised Code to ratify the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children and to establish the State Council on Educational Opportunity for Military Children and other offices to implement the state's participation in the compact.
Title
To ratify the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children and to establish the State Council on Educational Opportunity for Military Children and other offices to implement the state's participation in the compact.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-11 | To Education | |
2009-06-11 | Introduced to Senate | |
2009-06-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2009-06-03 | Committee Report - S | |
2009-04-29 | To Education | |
2009-04-29 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
33 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 01 | 60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 01 | 61 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 01 | 62 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 01 | 63 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 01 | 64 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=128_HB_165 |
Text | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/BillText128/128_HB_165_PH_Y.html |