OH HB163 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-14)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3727.53 and to enact section 3727.58 of the Revised Code to prohibit a hospital from requiring a nurse to work overtime as a condition of continued employment.
Title
Prohibit mandatory nurse overtime
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health |
2021-06-10 | House | Passed |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported: Commerce and Labor |
2021-03-03 | House | Refer to Committee: Commerce and Labor |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 27 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 27 | 58 | New Code | See Bill Text |