OH HB160 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Effective 10/13/20 - Emergency: effective 10/13/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3717.22, 4301.17, 4301.82, 4303.041, 4303.051, and 4303.182 of the Revised Code to revise certain provisions of the liquor control laws and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise alcoholic ice cream law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-01 - House - House Failed (Y: 35 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-13 Effective 10/13/20 - Emergency: effective 10/13/20
2020-09-23SenateConference report agreed to
2020-09-23HouseConference report agreed to: Conference Committee on H.B. 160
2020-09-22SenateConference managers: Sens. - Hoagland, Hottinger, O'Brien: Conference Committee on H.B. 160
2020-09-21HouseConference managers: Reps. - Wiggam, Carfagna, Kelly
2020-09-02SenateInsist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
2020-09-01HouseRefused to concur in Senate amendments
2020-08-31HouseAmendments laid over under the rule
2020-06-10SenatePassed - Amended
2020-06-10SenateReported - Substitute: Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-10-09SenateRefer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-10-07SenateIntroduced
2019-10-02HousePassed
2019-06-13HouseReported: State and Local Government
2019-03-26HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2019-03-25HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
371722Amended CodeCitation Text
43Amended CodeCitation Text
430117Amended CodeCitation Text
430182Amended CodeCitation Text
4303Amended CodeCitation Text
4303041Amended CodeCitation Text
4303051Amended CodeCitation Text
4303182Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-HB-160
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb160/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb160/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb160/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb160/RS/03?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb160/PS/04?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb160/CR/05?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb160/EN/06?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-HB-160

Bill Comments 750

feedback