OH HB158 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Local Government Public Safety and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 4509.101 of the Revised Code to waive the fee for filing a petition for limited driving privileges for an individual who qualifies as indigent and whose license is suspended as a result of failure to maintain proof of financial responsibility, and to authorize a court to grant such limited driving privileges on a first offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Waive fee for indigent petitioning for limited driving privileges

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-09SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2019-10-07SenateIntroduced
2019-10-02HousePassed
2019-06-26HouseReported: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-03-26HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4509Amended CodeCitation Text
4509101Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback