OH HB152 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 3773.32 of the Revised Code to exempt amateur boxing, kick boxing, karate, or wrestling events that benefit a charitable organization conducted under the supervision of the fraternal order of police of Ohio, the Ohio association of professional firefighters, or the Northern Ohio Fire Fighters from regulation by the Ohio Athletics Commission.
Title
To exempt amateur boxing, kick boxing, karate, or wrestling events that benefit a charitable organization conducted under the supervision of the fraternal order of police of Ohio, the Ohio association of professional firefighters, or the Northern Ohio Fire Fighters from regulation by the Ohio Athletics Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-06 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-04 | Governor' Action | |
2012-05-08 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-04-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-18 | Concurrence | |
2012-04-18 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-06-23 | Committee Report | |
2011-05-05 | To Health, Human Services, & Aging | |
2011-05-05 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-05-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-04-13 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-03-15 | To State Government & Elections | |
2011-03-15 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 73 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 73 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |