OH HB150 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 120.521 and 5747.01 and to enact sections 3333.13, 3333.131, 3333.132, 3333.133, 3333.134, 3333.135, 3333.136, and 3333.137 of the Revised Code to establish the Rural Practice Incentive Program, to establish a task force to study Ohio's indigent defense system, and to make an appropriation.
Title
Establish Ohio Public Defender State Loan Repayment Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2022-11-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-11-16 | House | Passed |
2022-11-16 | House | Informally passed |
2022-11-16 | House | Reported - Amended: Finance |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported - Re-referred to Rules and Reference: Criminal Justice |
2021-02-24 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
State and Local Government : State Government
Taxation
State and Local Government : State Government
Taxation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 20 | 521 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 33 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 33 | 131 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 33 | 132 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 33 | 133 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 33 | 134 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 33 | 135 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 33 | 136 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 33 | 137 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 47 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |