OH HB150 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-4)
Status: Enrolled on December 22 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-22 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 5726.01, 5726.02, 5726.04, 5726.06, and 5751.01 of the Revised Code to reduce the tax liability of newly formed banks by up to one million dollars per year for their first three years and to exclude the principal balance of mortgage loans sold by a mortgage lender from the lender's commercial activity tax gross receipts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduce taxes on new banks and mortgage lenders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-22HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2020-12-22SenatePassed
2020-12-18SenateInformally passed
2020-12-17SenateInformally passed
2020-12-16SenateInformally passed
2020-12-15SenateInformally passed
2020-12-14SenateInformally passed
2020-12-10SenateInformally passed
2020-12-09SenateInformally passed
2020-12-08SenateInformally passed
2020-12-03SenateInformally passed
2020-12-02SenateInformally passed
2020-12-02SenateReported - Amended: Insurance and Financial Institutions
2020-05-27SenateRefer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions
2020-02-14SenateIntroduced
2020-02-12HousePassed
2020-02-11HouseInformally passed
2020-02-10HouseInformally passed
2020-02-06HouseInformally passed
2020-01-30HouseReported - Substitute: Financial Institutions
2019-03-26HouseRefer to Committee: Financial Institutions
2019-03-19HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5726Amended CodeCitation Text
572601Amended CodeCitation Text
572602Amended CodeCitation Text
572604Amended CodeCitation Text
572606Amended CodeCitation Text
575101Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback