OH HB142 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Effective 3/23/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Effective 3/23/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.256 of the Revised Code to designate the month of March as "Endometriosis Awareness Month."
Title
Designates an awareness month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Effective 3/23/16 | |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Passed |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Reported: Health and Human Services |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health and Human Services |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-05-27 | House | Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported: Health and Aging |
2015-04-14 | House | Refer to Committee: Health and Aging |
2015-04-01 | House | Introduced |