OH HB137 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-31)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Effective 3/20/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 2151.421 of the Revised Code to make peace officers mandatory reporters of child abuse or neglect and to expand the types of peace officers authorized to receive reports of child abuse and neglect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make municipal and county peace officers child abuse reporters

Sponsors

Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]
Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]
Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. John Boccieri [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]
Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]
Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]
Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]
Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]
Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Sen. George Lang [R]Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. John Patterson [D]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]
Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]
Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]
Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]Sen. William Coley [R]
Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]
Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]
Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]
Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]

Roll Calls

2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20 Effective 3/20/19
2018-12-06HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-12-06SenatePassed
2018-12-06SenateInformally passed
2018-12-06SenateReported - Amended: Government Oversight and Reform
2017-11-29SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2017-11-02SenateIntroduced
2017-11-01HousePassed
2017-10-11HouseReported - Amended: Criminal Justice
2017-03-29HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2017-03-21HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21Amended CodeCitation Text
2151Amended CodeCitation Text
2151421Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback