OH HB133 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-6)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective 9/1/21 - Some provisions effective June 2, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-6)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective 9/1/21 - Some provisions effective June 2, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 135.77, 135.774, 1115.05, 1321.52, 1321.68, 1322.01, 1322.02, 1322.04, 1322.07, 1322.09, 1322.10, 1322.12, 1322.15, 1322.29, 1322.30, 1322.32, 1322.34, 1322.43, 1322.50, 1322.52, 1345.01, 1349.72, 2305.117, 2913.11, and 4712.05; to enact section 1319.17; and to repeal sections 1322.24, 1322.25, and 1349.16 of the Revised Code relating to commerce, to repeal the version of section 1322.24 of the Revised Code that is scheduled to take effect October 9, 2021, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Regards commerce and property tax valuation complaints
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Effective 9/1/21 - Some provisions effective June 2, 2021 | |
2021-05-19 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Financial Institutions and Technology |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Financial Institutions and Technology |
2021-03-17 | House | Passed |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported - Amended: Financial Institutions |
2021-02-24 | House | Refer to Committee: Financial Institutions |
2021-02-17 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 35 | 77 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 35 | 774 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 15 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 19 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 21 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 21 | 68 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 24 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 25 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 22 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 45 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 49 | 16 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
13 | 49 | 72 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 05 | 117 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 13 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 12 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |