OH HB131 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Effective 3/23/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Effective 3/23/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 901.23, 921.12, 940.02, 941.01, 941.03, 941.04, 941.06, 941.07, 941.09, 941.10, 941.11, 941.14, 943.02, 943.14, 1327.46, 1327.48, 1327.50, 1327.501, 1327.61, 1327.99, and 4707.02 and to enact section 1327.502 of the Revised Code to include diseases of concern within the scope of the Animal Diseases Law, and to make changes to the laws governing weights and measures, livestock dealers, auctioneers, the membership of the Farmland Preservation Advisory Board, the duties of the Ohio Soil and Water Conservation Commission, and the pesticide licensing renewal process.
Title
Revises Animal Diseases Law and other agricultural laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Effective 3/23/16 | |
2015-12-08 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Passed |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Rules and Reference |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Agriculture |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-05-27 | House | Passed |
2015-05-19 | House | Reported: Agriculture and Rural Development |
2015-04-14 | House | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Rural Development |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture : Animals
Agriculture : Fertilizers and Pesticides
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Utilities : Gas Utilities
Agriculture : Animals
Agriculture : Fertilizers and Pesticides
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Utilities : Gas Utilities