OH HB130 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-28 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-28 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 149.43 and to enact sections 117.432, 149.60, 149.62, and 149.65 of the Revised Code to create the DataOhio Board, to specify requirements for posting public records online, to require the Auditor of State to adopt rules regarding a uniform accounting system for public offices, to establish an online catalog of public data at data.Ohio.gov, to establish the Local Government Information Exchange Grant Program, and to make an appropriation.
Title
Specifies transparency requirements for public offices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-06 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-05-18 | House | Passed |
2016-04-25 | House | Reported: Finance |
2015-10-06 | House | Re-referred: Finance |
2015-06-17 | House | Reported - Substitute: State Government |
2015-04-14 | House | Refer to Committee: State Government |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
State and Local Government : Local Government
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
State and Local Government : Public Records
State and Local Government : State Government
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
State and Local Government : Public Records
State and Local Government : State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 17 | 432 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 49 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 49 | 60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 49 | 62 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 49 | 65 | New Code | See Bill Text |