OH HB126 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Effective 7/21/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4503.06, 5715.19, and 5717.01 of the Revised Code to modify the law governing property tax complaints.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards process for local governments to contest property value

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-02 - House - House Failed (Y: 0 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 62 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-06 Effective 7/21/22
2022-04-06SenateConference report agreed to
2022-04-06HouseConference report agreed to: Conference Committee on H.B. 126
2022-04-05SenateConference managers: Sens. - Blessing, Roegner, Williams
2022-04-04HouseConference managers: Reps. - Merrin, Stephens, Liston
2022-03-16SenateInsist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
2022-03-02HouseRefused to concur in Senate amendments
2021-12-15SenatePassed
2021-12-08SenateReported - Substitute: Ways and Means
2021-04-28SenateRe-referred: Ways and Means
2021-04-21SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government and Elections
2021-04-15HousePassed
2021-03-24HouseReported: Ways and Means
2021-02-17HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
450306Amended CodeCitation Text
571519Amended CodeCitation Text
571701Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-126
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb126/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb126/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb126/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb126/RCS/03?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb126/RS/04/hb126_04_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb126/PS/05/hb126_05_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb126/CR/06/hb126_06_CR?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb126/EN/07/hb126_07_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15717&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15817&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16183&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16264&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16325&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17349&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17756&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18003&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18008&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18032&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18119&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18892&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18885&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18939&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18963&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18974&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-126

Bill Comments

feedback