OH HB125 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-26 - Reported - Amended: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-26 - Reported - Amended: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1901.20, 1907.02, and 4511.093 and to enact section 4511.072 of the Revised Code to specify the jurisdiction of municipal and county courts over civil violations of municipal traffic ordinances, to prohibit townships from using traffic law photo-monitoring devices on interstate highways, and to establish requirements governing fines, fees, or other charges for traffic violations and infractions imposed by a municipal corporation that does not have the authority to establish a mayor's court.
Title
Specify court jurisdiction over municipal traffic ordinances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-06-21 | House | Passed |
2017-06-21 | House | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2017-03-21 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
State and Local Government : Local Government
Transportation
Transportation : Traffic Offenses
State and Local Government : Local Government
Transportation
Transportation : Traffic Offenses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
19 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 01 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 07 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
45 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 11 | 072 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 11 | 093 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 13 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text |