OH HB123 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3735.65, 3735.66, 3735.671, 3735.672, 3735.68, 3735.69, 5709.631, 5709.82, and 5709.85 and to repeal section 3735.673 of the Revised Code to modify the law governing community reinvestment areas and the terms under which property may be exempted in such areas.
Title
Modify the law governing community reinvestment areas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed - Amended |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2021-02-17 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 35 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 35 | 66 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 35 | 671 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 35 | 672 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 35 | 673 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
37 | 35 | 68 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 35 | 69 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 631 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 82 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |