OH HB123 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on July 21 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 149.433, 3313.536, 3313.60, 3313.951, 3314.03, 3319.073, 3319.31, 3326.11, 3328.24, and 3737.73; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 3313.536 (5502.262); and to enact sections 3301.221, 3313.669, 3313.6610, 3313.6611, and 5502.263 of the Revised Code and to amend Sections 221.30 and 265.210, as subsequently amended, of H.B. 166 of the 133rd General Assembly to enact the "Safety and Violence Education Students (SAVE Students) Act" regarding school security and youth suicide awareness education and training, to specify which public schools are eligible for school safety training grants, to establish, for fiscal year 2021, a pilot program to provide additional funding for students enrolled in grades eight through twelve in certain internet- or computer-based community schools in which a majority of the students were enrolled in a dropout prevention and recovery program for the 2019-2020 school year, to earmark an appropriation, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards school security and youth suicide awareness/training

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-21SenatePassed
2020-07-07SenateReported - Substitute: Education
2019-10-09SenateRefer to Committee: Education
2019-10-07SenateIntroduced
2019-10-02HousePassed
2019-06-19HouseReported - Substitute: Primary and Secondary Education
2019-03-12HouseRefer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
2019-03-06HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
149Amended CodeCitation Text
149433Amended CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3301New CodeSee Bill Text
3301221New CodeSee Bill Text
3313Amended CodeCitation Text
3313536Amended CodeCitation Text
331360Amended CodeCitation Text
33136610New CodeSee Bill Text
33136611New CodeSee Bill Text
3313669New CodeSee Bill Text
3313951Amended CodeCitation Text
3314Amended CodeCitation Text
331403Amended CodeCitation Text
3319Amended CodeCitation Text
3319073Amended CodeCitation Text
331931Amended CodeCitation Text
3326Amended CodeCitation Text
332611Amended CodeCitation Text
3328Amended CodeCitation Text
332824Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3737Amended CodeCitation Text
373773Amended CodeCitation Text
55New CodeSee Bill Text
5502New CodeSee Bill Text
5502263New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback