OH HB122 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 52-25)
Status: Passed on December 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-09 - Effective 3/23/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3902.30, 4723.94, 4731.251, 4731.252, 4731.253, 4731.2910, 4731.30, 4732.33, and 5164.95; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 4731.253 (4731.254) and 4731.2910 (4743.09); and to enact new section 4731.253 and sections 3319.2212, 3701.1310, 3721.60, 4715.438, 4725.35, 4729.285, 4730.60, 4731.741, 4734.60, 4753.20, 4755.90, 4757.50, 4758.80, 4759.20, 4761.30, 4778.30, 4783.20, 5119.368, and 5164.291 of the Revised Code, and to amend Section 3 of S.B. 9 of the 130th General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to establish and modify requirements regarding the provision of telehealth services, to establish a provider credentialing program within the Medicaid program, to revise the law governing the State Medical Board's One-Bite Program, and to extend the suspension of certain programs and requirements under the state's insurance laws until January 1, 2026.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards the provision of telehealth services

Sponsors

Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Willis Blackshear [D]
Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]
Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Thomas Hall [R]
Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]
Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]
Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Sharon Ray [R]
Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. William Seitz [R]
Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Monique Smith [D]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]
Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Bob Young [R]
Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]
Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]
Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]
Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]
Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Sandra O'Brien [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]
Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]
Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-12-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-09 Effective 3/23/22
2021-12-09HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2021-12-08SenatePassed
2021-12-08SenateReported - Substitute: Health
2021-04-21SenateRefer to Committee: Health
2021-04-15HousePassed
2021-03-25HouseReported - Substitute: Insurance
2021-02-17HouseRefer to Committee: Insurance
2021-02-16HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
390230Amended CodeCitation Text
472394Amended CodeCitation Text
4731251Amended CodeCitation Text
4731252Amended CodeCitation Text
4731253Amended CodeCitation Text
47312910Amended CodeCitation Text
473130Amended CodeCitation Text
473233Amended CodeCitation Text
516495Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-122
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb122/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb122/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb122/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb122/RS/03/hb122_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb122/PS/04/hb122_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb122/EN/05/hb122_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15720&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15842&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16225&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16227&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16318&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16440&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17786&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17833&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18018&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18040&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18024&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18023&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18089&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18198&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18210&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-122

Bill Comments

feedback