OH HB122 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-14)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-14)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3901.17, 3905.30, 3905.31, 3905.33, 3905.34, 3905.36, 3905.37, and 3905.38 and to enact section 3905.331 of the Revised Code to exempt state surplus lines insurance from regulation in Ohio when Ohio is not the home state of the insured and to make other changes to the law regulating surplus lines insurance.
Title
To exempt state surplus lines insurance from regulation in Ohio when Ohio is not the home state of the insured and to make other changes to the law regulating surplus lines insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective Date | |
2011-03-18 | Governor' Action | |
2011-03-16 | Concurrence | |
2011-03-16 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-03-16 | Committee Report - A | |
2011-03-10 | To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-03-09 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-03-09 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-02-24 | To Insurance | |
2011-02-24 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
39 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 01 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 05 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 05 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 05 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 05 | 331 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 05 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 05 | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 05 | 37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 05 | 38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |