OH HB121 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Effective 5/17/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Effective 5/17/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.2298 of the Revised Code to designate the last week of July as "Service Dog Awareness Week."
Title
Creates an awareness week
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Effective 5/17/16 | |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Passed |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Reported: Health and Human Services |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health and Human Services |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-05-13 | House | Passed |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported: State Government |
2015-03-24 | House | Refer to Committee: State Government |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced |