OH HB117 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-11)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-11)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 4123.351 and to enact sections 3964.01 to 3964.15, 3964.17, 3964.171, 3964.172, 3964.173, 3964.174, 3964.175, 3964.176, 3964.177, 3964.178, 3964.179, 3964.1710, 3964.18, 3964.19, 3964.191, 3964.193, 3964.194, 3964.20, and 3964.21 of the Revised Code to provide for the operation of captive insurance companies in Ohio and special purpose financial captive insurance companies.
Title
To provide for the operation of captive insurance companies in Ohio and special purpose financial captive insurance companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-17 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-21 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-03 | Concurrence | |
2014-05-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-20 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-06-05 | To Insurance & Financial Institutions | |
2013-06-05 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-06-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-05-15 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-04-08 | To Insurance | |
2013-04-08 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
39 | 64 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 64 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 171 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 1710 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 172 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 173 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 174 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 175 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 176 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 177 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 178 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 179 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 191 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 193 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 194 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 64 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
41 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
41 | 23 | 351 | Amended Code | Citation Text |