OH HB116 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 5733.40 and 5747.01 of the Revised Code to allow taxpayers to deduct in a single year the full bonus depreciation and enhanced expensing allowances the taxpayer deducts for federal income tax purposes.
Title
Regards deduction of bonus depreciation and expensing allowances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to committee: Ways and Means |
2023-03-16 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 33 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |