OH HB116 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-18)
Status: Engrossed on September 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-25 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 5739.01 and 5739.02 of the Revised Code to exempt prescription eyeglasses, contact lenses, and other optical aids sold by licensed dispensers from sales and use tax beginning July 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempt optical aids from sales tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-25SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2017-09-21SenateIntroduced
2017-09-20HousePassed
2017-04-26HouseReported - Amended: Ways and Means
2017-03-14HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5739Amended CodeCitation Text
573901Amended CodeCitation Text
573902Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback