OH HB116 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2015 - 50% progression
Action: 2015-09-17 - Refer to Committee: Medicaid
Pending: Senate Medicaid Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]


To amend sections 1739.05, 5164.01, 5164.753, 5164.757, 5167.01, and 5167.12 and to enact sections 1751.68, 3923.602, 4729.20, and 5164.7511 of the Revised Code regarding insurance and Medicaid coverage of medication synchronization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Partial prescription refills-to synchronize multiple prescriptions for patient


Roll Calls

2015-06-30 - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House Favorable Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2015-09-17SenateRefer to Committee: Medicaid
2015-07-01SenateSaid Bill/s Considered First Time
2015-06-30HouseBill Passed
2015-06-24HouseAccept Standing Committee Report - Substitute: Health and Aging
2015-03-24HouseRefer to Committee: Health and Aging
2015-03-11HouseIntroduce Legislation


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1739Amended CodeCitation Text
173905Amended CodeCitation Text
1751New CodeSee Bill Text
175168New CodeSee Bill Text
39New CodeSee Bill Text
3923New CodeSee Bill Text
3923602New CodeSee Bill Text
47New CodeSee Bill Text
4729New CodeSee Bill Text
472920New CodeSee Bill Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5164Amended CodeCitation Text
516401Amended CodeCitation Text
51647511New CodeSee Bill Text
5164753Amended CodeCitation Text
5164757Amended CodeCitation Text
5167Amended CodeCitation Text
516701Amended CodeCitation Text
516712Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

Bill Comments