OH HB111 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Effective 9/28/18 - Emergency: Certain sections effective June 29, 2018; other sections effective June 29, 2019 or September 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 140.01, 339.01, 2925.03, 3715.08, 3719.13, 3719.27, 3719.61, 3721.01, 4723.41, 4723.431, 4723.44, 4723.482, 4723.75, 4729.291, 4729.292, 4730.19, 4731.09, 4731.19, 4731.22, 4731.222, 4731.27, 4731.291, 4731.295, 4731.297, 4731.52, 4759.05, 4761.03, 4761.05, 4761.06, 4779.08, 4779.19, 4779.20, 5119.01, 5119.21, 5119.34, 5119.36, 5119.361, 5119.37, 5119.39, 5119.391, 5119.392, 5119.99, 5122.01, and 5122.10; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 5119.37 (5119.431) and 5119.39 (5119.43); to enact new section 5119.37 and sections 5119.35 and 5119.371 of the Revised Code; and to amend Section 757.20 of Am. Sub. H.B. 49 of the 132nd General Assembly to authorize certain advanced practice registered nurses (APRNs) to have a person involuntarily transported to a hospital for a mental health examination; to modify APRN standard care arrangement requirements; to clarify APRN license application requirements; to grandfather certain APRNs from meeting educational and examination requirements for licensure; to reduce the pre-examination practice requirement for certain dialysis technician applicants; to make changes in the laws administered by the State Medical Board, including those related to physician training certificates and limited permits to practice respiratory care; to coordinate procedures for investigating Respiratory Care Law violations with procedures governing State Medical Board investigations; to make changes relating to physician assistant supervision agreements; to authorize a board of county hospital trustees of a charter county hospital to have hospital facilities in a county contiguous to any charter county; to establish a biennial license renewal system for orthotists, prosthetists, and pedorthists; to modify an allocation to children's crisis care facilities; to require certification of certain addiction services; to modify the requirements for licensure of methadone treatment programs and to require licensure of other opioid treatment programs; to repeal sections 5119.367, 5119.391, and 5119.392 of the Revised Code twelve months after the effective date of this act; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize nurses to compel mental health evaluations

Sponsors

Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. James Butler [R]
Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]
Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Ron Young [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]
Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. John Boccieri [D]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]
Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]
Rep. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]
Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]
Rep. Candice Keller [R]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Nathan Manning [R]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]
Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]
Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Martin Sweeney [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]
Sen. Edna Brown [D]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]
Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28 Effective 9/28/18 - Emergency: Certain sections effective June 29, 2018; other sections effective June 29, 2019 or September 29, 2019
2018-06-20HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-05-23SenatePassed - Amended
2018-05-23SenateReported - Substitute: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2017-04-26SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2017-04-05SenateIntroduced
2017-03-30HousePassed
2017-03-29HouseReported: Health
2017-03-14HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
140Amended CodeCitation Text
14001Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2925Amended CodeCitation Text
292503Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
339Amended CodeCitation Text
33901Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3715Amended CodeCitation Text
371508Amended CodeCitation Text
3719Amended CodeCitation Text
371913Amended CodeCitation Text
371927Amended CodeCitation Text
371961Amended CodeCitation Text
3721Amended CodeCitation Text
372101Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4723Amended CodeCitation Text
472341Amended CodeCitation Text
4723431Amended CodeCitation Text
472344Amended CodeCitation Text
4723482Amended CodeCitation Text
472375Amended CodeCitation Text
4729Amended CodeCitation Text
4729291Amended CodeCitation Text
4729292Amended CodeCitation Text
4730Amended CodeCitation Text
473019Amended CodeCitation Text
4731Amended CodeCitation Text
473109Amended CodeCitation Text
473119Amended CodeCitation Text
473122Amended CodeCitation Text
4731222Amended CodeCitation Text
473127Amended CodeCitation Text
4731291Amended CodeCitation Text
4731295Amended CodeCitation Text
4731297Amended CodeCitation Text
473152Amended CodeCitation Text
4759Amended CodeCitation Text
475905Amended CodeCitation Text
4761Amended CodeCitation Text
476103Amended CodeCitation Text
476105Amended CodeCitation Text
476106Amended CodeCitation Text
4779Amended CodeCitation Text
477908Amended CodeCitation Text
477919Amended CodeCitation Text
477920Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5119Amended CodeCitation Text
511901Amended CodeCitation Text
511921Amended CodeCitation Text
511934Amended CodeCitation Text
511936Amended CodeCitation Text
5119361Amended CodeCitation Text
5119367Repealed CodeCitation Text
511937Amended CodeCitation Text
511939Amended CodeCitation Text
5119391Amended CodeCitation Text
5119392Amended CodeCitation Text
511999Amended CodeCitation Text
5122Amended CodeCitation Text
512201Amended CodeCitation Text
512210Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback